Senate | 05/25/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2161 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1390 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1027 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 707 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 325 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 325 | |
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |