House
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1218
|
Journal Page: 3843
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Motion to suspend posting rule fails
|
|
Journal Page: 3843
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3404
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1571
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1504
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1245
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1245
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to s/c on Border Security by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 339
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 339
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|