E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 3103
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1633
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3580
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1119
|
Journal Page: 3580
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3580
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3580
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2343
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3452
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2675
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 339
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 339
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|