House
|
05/26/2015
|
Postponed
|
8/1/15 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4703
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4702
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/26/15 3:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 4538
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4538
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/25/15 3:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4174
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4174
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 671
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 639
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 339
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 339
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|