E
|
05/18/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
E
|
05/06/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1393
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2672
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1342
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1393
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1311
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2402
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#570
|
Journal Page: 2401
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2401
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2401
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/1/15 3:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2298
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2298
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 2142
|
Journal Page: 2298
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2451
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 341
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 341
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|