Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB873 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 873
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2015; March 4, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 873 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the courts authorized to hear certain matters relating
 to a capias pro fine.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 43.05(b), Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A capias pro fine authorizes a peace officer to place
 the defendant in jail until the business day following the date of
 the defendant's arrest if the defendant cannot be brought before
 the court immediately.  Instead of placing the defendant in jail as
 authorized by this subsection, the peace officer may bring the
 defendant before another court that is in the same territorial
 jurisdiction as, and that has concurrent jurisdiction with, the
 court that issued the capias pro fine.
 SECTION 2.  Article 45.045, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Instead of placing the defendant in jail as authorized
 by Subsection (a), the peace officer may bring the defendant before
 another court that is in the same county as, and that has concurrent
 jurisdiction with, the court that issued the capias pro fine.
 SECTION 3.  Article 45.046, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  For purposes of a hearing described by Subsection (a),
 if the defendant cannot be immediately brought before the court
 that entered the judgment and sentence against the defendant,
 another court that is in the same county as, and that has concurrent
 jurisdiction with, the court that entered the judgment and sentence
 may conduct the hearing.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *