E | 06/19/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3648 | |
E | 05/30/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3592 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5692 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3503 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3439 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 5208 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2789 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 2789 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 2789 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2788 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 1690 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Record vote | RV#1199 | Journal Page: 3802 |
House | 05/19/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 3696 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Amended | 1-Sheets | Journal Page: 3696 |
House | 05/18/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3696 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Postponed | 5/15/15 12:25 AM | Journal Page: 3541 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3541 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2893 | Journal Page: 3541 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2109 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2109 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1495 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 342 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 342 | |
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |