Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB881 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Nelson S.B. No. 881
2- (Springer, Murphy)
1+S.B. No. 881
32
43
5- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
64 AN ACT
75 relating to the dedication of certain wine-related revenue.
86 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
97 SECTION 1. Section 205.03, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
108 amended by amending Subsections (b), (c), (d), (e), (j), (n), and
119 (p) and adding Subsection (n-1) to read as follows:
1210 (b) Notwithstanding Section 205.02, the following revenue
1311 may be appropriated for each state fiscal year only as specified by
1412 this section:
1513 (1) the lesser of:
1614 (A) the amount, if any, by which the amount of
1715 revenue derived from excise taxes on wine produced in a state other
1816 than Texas and any sales taxes collected from holders of
1917 out-of-state winery direct shipper's permits as a result of the
2018 passage of Senate Bill No. 877 by the 79th Legislature, Regular
2119 Session, 2005, according to the most recent projection, as of the
2220 beginning of the fiscal year, by the comptroller for the fiscal year
2321 exceeds the amount of revenue from those sources for fiscal year
2422 2014 [2004], compounded annually for fiscal years 2015-2025
2523 [2005-2015] by the average percentage by which revenue from those
2624 sources increased from one fiscal year to the next between
2725 September 1, 2005 [1999], and August 31, 2013 [2003]; or
2826 (B) $1 million; and
2927 (2) the lesser of:
3028 (A) the amount, if any, by which revenue derived
3129 from excise taxes on wine produced in this state and sales taxes
3230 remitted by holders of winery permits in this state, according to
3331 the most recent projection, as of the beginning of the fiscal year,
3432 by the comptroller for the fiscal year exceeds the amount of revenue
3533 from those sources for fiscal year 2014 [2004], compounded annually
3634 for fiscal years 2015-2025 [2005-2015] by the average percentage by
3735 which revenue from those sources increased from one fiscal year to
3836 the next between September 1, 2005 [1999], and August 31, 2013
3937 [2003]; or
4038 (B) $1 million.
4139 (c) Out of the amounts available under Subsections (b)(1) and
4240 (2) for a fiscal year, the lesser of $830,000 [$50,000] or the total
4341 amount available under those subdivisions may be appropriated only
4442 to [the] Texas A&M AgriLife [Cooperative] Extension Service [for
4543 extension viticulture operations].
4644 (d) If the amount available for a fiscal year under
4745 Subsections (b)(1) and (2) exceeds $830,000 [$50,000], the lesser
4846 of $365,000 [$50,000] or the total amount available under those
4947 subdivisions may be appropriated only to the Texas Tech University
5048 Viticulture and Enology program [Agricultural Experiment Station
5149 for viticulture research].
5250 (e) If the amount available for a fiscal year under
5351 Subsections (b)(1) and (2) exceeds $1,195,000 [$100,000], the
5452 lesser of the amount remaining under Subsection (b)(2) or $150,000
5553 [$65,000] may be appropriated only to the Texas Wine Marketing
5654 Research Institute at Texas Tech University.
5755 (j) If the amount available for a fiscal year under
5856 Subsections (b)(1) and (2) exceeds the maximum amount that may be
5957 appropriated under Subsections (c), (d), and (e) [(c)-(g)], the
6058 lesser of the amount remaining under Subsections (b)(1) and (2) or
6159 $150,000 [$50,000] may be appropriated only for distribution to the
6260 T. V. Munson Viticulture and Enology Center of the [at] Grayson
6361 County Junior [Community] College District to fund educational
6462 programs [the associate degree program] at the center.
6563 (n) If revenue [Revenue] derived under Subsection (b)(2) is
6664 [and] not otherwise appropriated under this section, the lesser of
6765 that remaining revenue or $300,000 [Subsections (c)-(k)] may be
6866 appropriated only for deposit into the wine industry development
6967 fund:
7068 (1) for the development of technologies, strategies,
7169 and practices for mitigating or eliminating the effects of frost,
7270 pestilence, or infestation on grapevines for which money donated
7371 from private sources under Chapter 50B, Agriculture Code, is also
7472 spent; and
7573 (2) in an amount that does not exceed the amount of the
7674 donated money described by Subdivision (1) that is spent for the
7775 same purposes [of increasing the economic impact of the Texas wine
7876 producing industry on the state].
7977 (n-1) Any revenue available for a fiscal year under
8078 Subsection (b) that is not otherwise appropriated as authorized by
8179 this section may be appropriated only to the Department of
8280 Agriculture for deposit into the wine industry development fund
8381 for:
8482 (1) the development of technologies, strategies, and
8583 practices for mitigating or eliminating the effects of frost,
8684 pestilence, or infestation on grapevines; and
8785 (2) the department's direct and indirect costs
8886 associated with administering programs under Subsection (n) or
8987 Subdivision (1) of this subsection.
9088 (p) This section expires September 1, 2025 [2015].
9189 SECTION 2. Sections 205.03(a), (f), (g), (h), (i), (k),
9290 (l), (m), and (o), Alcoholic Beverage Code, are repealed.
9391 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
92+ ______________________________ ______________________________
93+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
94+ I hereby certify that S.B. No. 881 passed the Senate on
95+ May 5, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
96+ ______________________________
97+ Secretary of the Senate
98+ I hereby certify that S.B. No. 881 passed the House on
99+ May 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 12, two
100+ present not voting.
101+ ______________________________
102+ Chief Clerk of the House
103+ Approved:
104+ ______________________________
105+ Date
106+ ______________________________
107+ Governor