Senate | 04/07/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 693 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 672 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 350 | |
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 350 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |