Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5519
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5519
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5209
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5209
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5209
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2821
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2821
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2821
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2821
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2817
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2486
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4824
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4824
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1561
|
Journal Page: 4823
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4823
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4823
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4754
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1549
|
Journal Page: 4753
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4753
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amended
|
5-Howard
|
Journal Page: 4753
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
4-Howard
|
Journal Page: 4753
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4752
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/26/15 9:54 PM
|
Journal Page: 4743
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 4704
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4704
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 2547
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2547
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1496
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 755
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 751
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Estes
|
Journal Page: 751
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 751
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 748
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 706
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 696
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 653
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 653
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 382
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 362
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 362
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|