E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5210
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2087
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4475
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4475
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1435
|
Journal Page: 4474
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4474
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 11, Section 6(e)
|
Journal Page: 4474
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Sheets
|
Journal Page: 4474
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4474
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4464
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1431
|
Journal Page: 4463
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4463
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
12-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 4462
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amended
|
7-Sheets
|
Journal Page: 4453
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
5-Sheets
|
Journal Page: 4450
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 11, Section 6(c) and Rule 11, Section 8
|
Journal Page: 4449
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
4-Paul
|
Journal Page: 4448
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
|
Journal Page: 4448
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 4442
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4442
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/24/15 9:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4434
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4434
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4217
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2062
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1161
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1120
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1120
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1120
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1120
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Fraser
|
Journal Page: 1116
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1115
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1115
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1053
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1053
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1052
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 370
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 350
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 350
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|