Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB914 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Kolkhorst, et al. S.B. No. 914
2- (Schubert, Raymond, Naishtat)
1+S.B. No. 914
32
43
5- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
64 AN ACT
75 relating to a council on long-term care facility surveys and
86 informal dispute resolution.
97 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
108 SECTION 1. DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
119 (1) "Council" means the Long-Term Care Facility Survey
1210 and Informal Dispute Resolution Council established under this Act.
1311 (2) "Executive commissioner" means the executive
1412 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
1513 (3) "Long-term care facility" means a facility subject
1614 to regulation under Section 32.021(d), Human Resources Code, or
1715 Chapter 242, 247, or 252, Health and Safety Code.
1816 SECTION 2. COUNCIL ESTABLISHED; MEMBERSHIP; OFFICERS.
1917 (a) Not later than December 1, 2015, the executive commissioner
2018 shall establish a Long-Term Care Facility Survey and Informal
2119 Dispute Resolution Council. The council is composed of the
2220 following members appointed by the executive commissioner:
2321 (1) two program managers from different Department of
2422 Aging and Disability Services regions;
2523 (2) one surveyor who has attained at least the level of
2624 investigator IV;
2725 (3) two members of an enforcement team from different
2826 Department of Aging and Disability Services regions;
2927 (4) three surveyors, each from a different Department
3028 of Aging and Disability Services region, at least one of whom must
3129 have a background in nursing, at least one of whom must have a
3230 background in social work, and at least one of whom must have a
3331 background in the provision of pharmacy services;
3432 (5) one informal dispute resolution team leader;
3533 (6) one informal dispute resolution reviewer;
3634 (7) two owners or regional vice presidents of
3735 operation who oversee multiple long-term care facilities;
3836 (8) two regional quality assurance nurses who oversee
3937 multiple long-term care facilities;
4038 (9) two active long-term care facility
4139 administrators; and
4240 (10) two active long-term care facility directors of
4341 nursing.
4442 (b) The executive commissioner shall designate a member of
4543 the council to serve as presiding officer. The members of the
4644 council shall elect any other necessary officers.
4745 (c) A member of the council serves at the will of the
4846 executive commissioner.
4947 SECTION 3. MEETINGS. The council shall meet at the call of
5048 the executive commissioner.
5149 SECTION 4. REIMBURSEMENT OR COMPENSATION NOT AUTHORIZED. A
5250 member of the council is not entitled to reimbursement of expenses
5351 or to compensation for service on the council.
5452 SECTION 5. GIFTS OR GRANTS. The council may accept gifts
5553 and grants from any source to be used to carry out a function of the
5654 council.
5755 SECTION 6. DUTIES OF COUNCIL. (a) The council shall study
5856 and make recommendations regarding a consistent survey and informal
5957 dispute resolution process for long-term care facilities.
6058 (b) The council shall:
6159 (1) study and make recommendations regarding best
6260 practices and protocols to make survey, inspection, and informal
6361 dispute resolution processes more efficient and less burdensome on
6462 long-term care facilities; and
6563 (2) recommend uniform standards for those processes.
6664 SECTION 7. REPORT. Not later than January 1, 2017, the
6765 council shall submit a report on the council's findings and
6866 recommendations required by this Act to the executive commissioner,
6967 the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
7068 representatives, and the chairs of the appropriate legislative
7169 committees.
7270 SECTION 8. APPLICATION OF CERTAIN LAW. Chapter 2110,
7371 Government Code, does not apply to the council.
7472 SECTION 9. EXPIRATION. This Act expires June 1, 2017.
7573 SECTION 10. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
7674 September 1, 2015.
75+ ______________________________ ______________________________
76+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
77+ I hereby certify that S.B. No. 914 passed the Senate on
78+ April 20, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
79+ ______________________________
80+ Secretary of the Senate
81+ I hereby certify that S.B. No. 914 passed the House on
82+ May 19, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 1, two
83+ present not voting.
84+ ______________________________
85+ Chief Clerk of the House
86+ Approved:
87+ ______________________________
88+ Date
89+ ______________________________
90+ Governor