E | 06/09/2015 | Effective on 1/1/16 | ||
E | 06/09/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3645 | |
E | 05/22/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1946 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4214 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1946 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1806 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Record vote | RV#1239 | Journal Page: 3921 |
House | 05/21/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3921 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3921 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3675 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2445 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2445 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1202 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1142 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1142 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1142 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1142 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1142 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1142 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1142 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 352 | |
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 352 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |