Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB932 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Fraser S.B. No. 932
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2015; March 9, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and
 Economic Development; March 18, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Public Utility Commission of Texas
 to retain assistance for federal proceedings affecting certain
 electric utilities and consumers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.408 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.408.  HIRING ASSISTANCE FOR FEDERAL PROCEEDINGS.
 (a)  The commission may retain any consultant, accountant,
 auditor, engineer, or attorney the commission considers necessary
 to represent the commission in a proceeding before the Federal
 Energy Regulatory Commission, or before a court reviewing
 proceedings of that federal commission, related to:
 (1)  the relationship of an electric utility subject to
 this subchapter to a power region, regional transmission
 organization, or independent system operator;
 (2)  the approval of an agreement among the electric
 utility and the electric utility's affiliates concerning the
 coordination of the operations of the electric utility and the
 electric utility's affiliates; or
 (3)  other matters related to the electric utility
 subject to this subchapter that may affect the ultimate rates paid
 by retail customers in this state.
 (b)  Assistance for which a consultant, accountant, auditor,
 engineer, or attorney may be retained under Subsection (a) may
 include:
 (1)  conducting a study;
 (2)  conducting an investigation;
 (3)  presenting evidence;
 (4)  advising the commission; or
 (5)  representing the commission.
 (c)  The electric utility shall pay timely the reasonable
 costs of the services of a person retained under Subsection (a), as
 determined by the commission. The total costs an electric utility
 is required to pay under this subsection may not exceed $1.5 million
 in a 12-month period.
 (d)  The commission shall allow the electric utility to
 recover both the total costs the electric utility paid under
 Subsection (c) and the carrying charges for those costs through a
 rider established annually to recover the costs paid and carrying
 charges incurred during the preceding calendar year. The rider may
 not be implemented before the rider is reviewed and approved by the
 commission.
 (e)  The commission shall consult the attorney general
 before the commission retains a consultant, accountant, auditor, or
 engineer under Subsection (a). The retention of an attorney under
 Subsection (a) is subject to the approval of the attorney general
 under Section 402.0212, Government Code.
 (f)  The commission shall be precluded from engaging any
 individual who is required to register under Section 305.003,
 Government Code.
 (g)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  Section 39.4525, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (g) to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission may retain any consultant, accountant,
 auditor, engineer, or attorney the commission considers necessary
 to represent the commission in a proceeding before the Federal
 Energy Regulatory Commission, or before a court reviewing
 proceedings of that federal commission, related to:
 (1)  the relationship of an electric utility subject to
 this subchapter to a power region, regional transmission
 organization, or independent system operator; [or]
 (2)  the approval of an agreement among the electric
 utility and the electric utility's affiliates concerning the
 coordination of the operations of the electric utility and the
 electric utility's affiliates; or
 (3)  other matters related to the electric utility
 subject to this subchapter that may affect the ultimate rates paid
 by retail customers in this state.
 (g)  This section expires September 1, 2023 [December 31,
 2017].
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter K, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.504 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.504.  HIRING ASSISTANCE FOR FEDERAL PROCEEDINGS.
 (a)  The commission may retain any consultant, accountant,
 auditor, engineer, or attorney the commission considers necessary
 to represent the commission in a proceeding before the Federal
 Energy Regulatory Commission, or before a court reviewing
 proceedings of that federal commission, related to:
 (1)  the relationship of an electric utility subject to
 this subchapter to a power region, regional transmission
 organization, or independent system operator;
 (2)  the approval of an agreement among the electric
 utility and the electric utility's affiliates concerning the
 coordination of the operations of the electric utility and the
 electric utility's affiliates; or
 (3)  other matters related to the electric utility
 subject to this subchapter that may affect the ultimate rates paid
 by retail customers in this state.
 (b)  Assistance for which a consultant, accountant, auditor,
 engineer, or attorney may be retained under Subsection (a) may
 include:
 (1)  conducting a study;
 (2)  conducting an investigation;
 (3)  presenting evidence;
 (4)  advising the commission; or
 (5)  representing the commission.
 (c)  The electric utility shall pay timely the reasonable
 costs of the services of a person retained under Subsection (a), as
 determined by the commission. The total costs an electric utility
 is required to pay under this subsection may not exceed $1.5 million
 in a 12-month period.
 (d)  The commission shall allow the electric utility to
 recover both the total costs the electric utility paid under
 Subsection (c) and the carrying charges for those costs through a
 rider established annually to recover the costs paid and carrying
 charges incurred during the preceding calendar year. The rider may
 not be implemented before the rider is reviewed and approved by the
 commission.
 (e)  The commission shall consult the attorney general
 before the commission retains a consultant, accountant, auditor, or
 engineer under Subsection (a). The retention of an attorney under
 Subsection (a) is subject to the approval of the attorney general
 under Section 402.0212, Government Code.
 (f)  The commission shall be precluded from engaging any
 individual who is required to register under Section 305.003,
 Government Code.
 (g)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *