E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3103
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1938
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3696
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1174
|
Journal Page: 3695
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3695
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3695
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Farney
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/14/15 9:44 PM
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2609
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1942
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 V. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 1068
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1068
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1068
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1055
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 354
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 354
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|