House
|
05/27/2015
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4786
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4786
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4786
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 975
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 975
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 975
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 975
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 975
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 975
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 975
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 817
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 355
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 355
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|