Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB950 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2015

                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 950
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2015; March 9, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 14, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain procedural measures in a suit affecting a
 parent-child relationship to protect a child against child neglect
 or physical or sexual abuse.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 153.004(e) and (f), Family Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  It is a rebuttable presumption that it is not in the best
 interest of a child for a parent to have unsupervised visitation
 with the child if credible evidence is presented of a history or
 pattern of past or present child neglect or physical or sexual abuse
 by:
 (1)  that parent directed against the other parent, a
 spouse, or a child; or
 (2)  any person who resides in that parent's household
 or who by virtue of the person's relationship with that parent is
 otherwise likely to have unsupervised access to the child during
 that parent's periods of possession of or access to the child,
 directed against any person.
 (f)  In determining under this section whether there is
 credible evidence of a history or pattern of past or present child
 neglect or physical or sexual abuse by a parent or other person, as
 applicable [directed against the other parent, a spouse, or a
 child], the court shall consider whether a protective order was
 rendered under Chapter 85, Title 4, against the parent or other
 person during the two-year period preceding the filing of the suit
 or during the pendency of the suit.
 SECTION 2.  Section 153.0071(e-1), Family Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (e-1)  Notwithstanding Subsections (d) and (e), a court may
 decline to enter a judgment on a mediated settlement agreement if
 the court finds:
 (1)  that:
 (A) [(1)]  a party to the agreement was a victim
 of family violence, and that circumstance impaired the party's
 ability to make decisions; or
 (B)  the agreement would permit a person who is
 subject to registration under Chapter 62, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, or who otherwise has a history or pattern of past or
 present physical or sexual abuse directed against any person to:
 (i)  reside in the same household as the
 child; or
 (ii)  otherwise have unsupervised access to
 the child; and
 (2)  that the agreement is not in the child's best
 interest.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a suit affecting the parent-child relationship pending in a trial
 court on the effective date of this Act or filed on or after that
 date. A suit affecting the parent-child relationship in which a
 final order is rendered before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the order was rendered,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  The enactment of this Act constitutes a material
 and substantial change of circumstances sufficient to warrant
 modification of a court order or portion of a decree that provides
 for the possession of or access to a child rendered before the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *