House | 05/26/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/24/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4218 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2444 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2444 | |
House | 03/31/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 627 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 637 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 550 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 285 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 96 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 96 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |