Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB964 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 84R83 EAH-D
22 By: Fraser S.B. No. 964
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to the criteria for awarding the Texas Purple Heart Medal
88 to members of the armed forces wounded or killed at Fort Hood on
99 November 5, 2009.
1010 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1111 SECTION 1. Section 437.355(a), Government Code, is amended
1212 to read as follows:
1313 (a) The governor or adjutant general, if delegated the
1414 authority, may adopt policies and regulations relating to awarding:
1515 (1) the Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be
1616 awarded to a service member who:
1717 (A) [,] after September 11, 2001:
1818 (i) [(A)] was inducted into federal service
1919 from the Texas National Guard; and
2020 (ii) [(B)] meets the criteria for an award
2121 of the federal Purple Heart Medal; or
2222 (B) was wounded or killed at Fort Hood on
2323 November 5, 2009;
2424 (2) the Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be
2525 awarded to:
2626 (A) a service member of the Texas military forces
2727 who has:
2828 (i) completed 30 or more years of honorable
2929 state service or a combination of state and federal service; and
3030 (ii) continually demonstrated superior
3131 performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions
3232 demanding responsibility; or
3333 (B) a civilian who has contributed significant
3434 service to the Texas military forces;
3535 (3) the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal, which
3636 shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this state,
3737 another state, or the United States for exceptionally outstanding
3838 achievement or service to this state in performance of a duty of
3939 great responsibility while serving with the Texas military forces
4040 for whom the department receives a letter of recommendation for
4141 award of the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal that:
4242 (A) gives an account of the exceptional
4343 achievement or service; and
4444 (B) includes facts and photographs, and extracts
4545 from official documents to support and amplify the facts;
4646 (4) the Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which shall
4747 be awarded to a service member of the military forces of this state,
4848 another state, or the United States who has performed service in a
4949 superior and clearly outstanding manner;
5050 (5) the Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall
5151 be awarded to a service member who:
5252 (A) does not meet the criteria for an award of the
5353 federal Humanitarian Service Medal;
5454 (B) is a member of the Texas military forces; and
5555 (C) while serving on state active duty or active
5656 duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32, United
5757 States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a
5858 mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during
5959 or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state;
6060 (6) the Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which
6161 shall be awarded to a service member of the Texas military forces
6262 who served:
6363 (A) on or after September 11, 2001;
6464 (B) on state active duty or active duty under
6565 state authority in accordance with Title 32, United States Code;
6666 and
6767 (C) satisfactorily in defense support to a
6868 mission in the state under civilian authority;
6969 (7) the Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded
7070 to a service member who was inducted into federal service from the
7171 Texas military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or
7272 after June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days;
7373 (8) the Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be
7474 awarded to a service member of the Texas National Guard who served,
7575 after September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by
7676 the United States secretary of defense;
7777 (9) the Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be
7878 awarded to a member of the Texas military forces who has completed
7979 five years of honorable service during which the service member has
8080 shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to
8181 this state;
8282 (10) the Texas Medal of Merit, which shall be awarded
8383 to a member of the military forces of this state, another state, or
8484 the United States who performs outstanding service or attains
8585 extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States;
8686 (11) the Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall
8787 be awarded to a service member who completes three consecutive
8888 years of honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the
8989 service member has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and
9090 great loyalty to this state;
9191 (12) the Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign
9292 Medal, which shall be awarded to a service member who was inducted
9393 into federal service from the Texas National Guard after August 1,
9494 1990, in support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert
9595 Storm, without regard to the place that the service member was
9696 deployed while serving on active federal military duty;
9797 (13) the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which shall be
9898 awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
9999 from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place that the
100100 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
101101 military duty, after:
102102 (A) March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi
103103 Freedom; or
104104 (B) August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New
105105 Dawn; and
106106 (14) the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which shall
107107 be awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
108108 from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of
109109 Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the
110110 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
111111 military duty.
112112 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
113113 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
114114 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
115115 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
116116 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.