E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2666
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1556
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4806
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4806
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3896
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 363
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 363
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|