E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3103
|
E
|
05/26/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2404
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4230
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1344
|
Journal Page: 4230
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4230
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4230
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1943
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 V. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1027
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 363
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 363
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|