E | 06/01/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/01/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3644 | |
E | 05/21/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1850 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4082 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1809 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1850 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1739 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Record vote | RV#1198 | Journal Page: 3802 |
House | 05/19/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3795 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3795 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2965 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2263 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2263 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1580 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 364 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 364 | |
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |