Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB979 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 979
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2015; March 10, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 31, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to individual indemnity health insurance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1201.104(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  For individual accident and health insurance policies,
 the commissioner shall adopt rules establishing minimum standards
 for benefits under each of the following categories of coverage:
 (1)  basic hospital expense;
 (2)  basic medical-surgical expense;
 (3)  hospital [confinement] indemnity or other fixed
 indemnity;
 (4)  major medical expense;
 (5)  disability income protection;
 (6)  accident only;
 (7)  specified disease;
 (8)  specified accident; and
 (9)  limited benefit.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the commissioner
 of insurance shall adopt any rules necessary to implement Section
 1201.104, Insurance Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *