Senate | 05/04/2015 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1249 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |