Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR26 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill March 12, 2015

House Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2015
Bill May 8, 2015