House | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 3107 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1783 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 621 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 621 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 619 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |