Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR34 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton, Nichols S.C.R. No. 34
 (In the Senate - Filed March 23, 2015; March 30, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water, and
 Rural Affairs; April 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Among the most urgent issues facing Texas is the
 recent prolonged drought that has resulted in a diminished
 freshwater supply and the need to find alternative water sources;
 and
 WHEREAS, Montgomery County is one area that is facing special
 difficulties in sustaining an adequate water supply, not only
 because of the drought, but also because of its increasing
 population, which grew by 9.5 percent between 2010 and 2013, and its
 need to comply with a mandate to reduce usage of the Gulf Coast
 Aquifer by 30 percent by the year 2016; and
 WHEREAS, Texas is estimated to have more than 2.7 billion
 acre-feet of brackish groundwater, a crucial option for an
 alternative water supply, and desalination techniques can reduce
 the saline content of those brackish supplies to meet freshwater
 standards; and
 WHEREAS, The City of El Paso and Fort Bliss have established a
 successful desalination program at the Kay Bailey Hutchison
 Desalination Plant, which can produce up to 27.5 million gallons of
 potable water each day from brackish water; employing a similar
 desalination method, Montgomery County could replenish and
 maintain a sufficient water supply through its access to brackish
 groundwater sources; and
 WHEREAS, Treating the abundance of brackish groundwater in
 the area to comply with freshwater regulations has the potential to
 provide Montgomery County residents with sufficient water
 resources while alleviating pressure on freshwater resources, and
 this innovative process is indeed deserving of further research;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby direct the Texas Water Development Board to conduct a
 feasibility study on the use of desalinated brackish groundwater
 from brackish groundwater sources for water supply in Montgomery
 County; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That this study be completed no later than January
 1, 2018; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the board submit a full report, including its
 findings and recommendations, to the 85th Texas Legislature, the
 county judge of Montgomery County, and the county commissioners of
 Montgomery County no later than June 1, 2018.
 * * * * *