E | 02/05/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 195 | |
E | 01/27/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 140 | |
House | 01/27/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 199 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 89 | |
Senate | 01/21/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 88 | |
Senate | 01/21/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 47 | |
House | 01/14/2015 | Record vote | RV#4 | Journal Page: 31 |
House | 01/14/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 31 | |
House | 01/14/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 31 | |
House | 01/14/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 49 | |
Senate | 01/13/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 9 | |
Senate | 01/13/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 9 | |
Senate | 01/13/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 9 | |
Senate | 01/13/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 8 | |
Senate | 01/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |