House | 05/21/2015 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 4082 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4084 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1757 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1757 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1757 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1757 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1625 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1582 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1534 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |