E | 06/09/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3645 | |
E | 05/26/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2404 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4570 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2089 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1966 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4287 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Record vote | RV#1364 | Journal Page: 4286 |
House | 05/23/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4286 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HCR 61 | Journal Page: 4286 |
House | 05/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4343 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 3106 | |
House | 03/25/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1028 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 561 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 561 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 561 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 561 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 501 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 215 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 193 | |
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 176 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to s/c on Border Security by Pres | Journal Page: 167 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 167 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 152 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 140 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 97 | |
Senate | 01/21/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 87 | |
Senate | 01/15/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/15/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |