Senate | 04/13/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 787 | |
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 296 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 252 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 167 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 167 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |