Senate | 03/03/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 327 | |
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 296 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 285 | |
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 176 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 167 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 167 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |