Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR19 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/06/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R2166 KLA-D
 By: Perry S.J.R. No. 19


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment limiting appropriations from
 the economic stabilization fund to a total amount that the
 comptroller of public accounts estimates will not result at any
 time in a fund balance of less than a prescribed minimum amount,
 other than in an emergency if certain requirements are met.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 49a, Article III, Texas Constitution, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c), (d),
 and (e) to read as follows:
 (b)  Except in the case of emergency and imperative public
 necessity and with a four-fifths vote of the total membership of
 each House:
 (1)  an [, no] appropriation in excess of the cash and
 anticipated revenue of the funds from which the [such]
 appropriation is to be made is not [shall be] valid; and
 (2)  an appropriation from the economic stabilization
 fund is not valid unless the Comptroller of Public Accounts
 determines the appropriation will not exceed the limitation on
 appropriations from that fund prescribed by Section 49-g(g-1) of
 this article.
 (c)  A [No] bill containing an appropriation is not [shall
 be] considered as passed and may not [or] be sent to the Governor
 for consideration until and unless the Comptroller of Public
 Accounts endorses the Comptroller's [his] certificate on the bill
 [thereon] showing that, subject to the exception provided by
 Subsection (b) of this section:
 (1)  the amount appropriated is within the amount
 estimated to be available in the affected funds; and
 (2)  if the bill appropriates an amount from the
 economic stabilization fund, the appropriated amount, when added to
 other amounts appropriated from the economic stabilization fund in
 bills certified under this subdivision, will not exceed the
 limitation on appropriations from that fund prescribed by Section
 49-g(g-1) of this article.
 (d)  In determining whether to certify a bill under
 Subsection (c)(2) of this section, the Comptroller of Public
 Accounts:
 (1)  shall consider the Comptroller's estimate of the
 unappropriated balance of the economic stabilization fund as of the
 first day of the period for which the appropriation is authorized,
 the estimated amount and timing of anticipated interest to be
 credited to the economic stabilization fund during the period for
 which the appropriation is authorized, and the estimated amounts
 and timing of anticipated transfers to the economic stabilization
 fund during that period that are required by Sections 49-g(b), (c),
 (d), and (e) of this article; and
 (2)  may not consider actual or anticipated transfers
 of money to or from the economic stabilization fund authorized by
 Section 49-g(j) of this article.
 (e)  When the Comptroller of Public Accounts finds that the
 Comptroller cannot make the certification required by Subsection
 (c)(1) or (2) of this section and the exception provided by
 Subsection (b) of this section does not apply, the Comptroller [an
 appropriation bill exceeds the estimated revenue he] shall endorse
 the [such] finding on the bill [thereon] and return the bill to the
 House in which the bill [same] originated. The finding immediately
 [Such information] shall be [immediately] made known to both the
 House of Representatives and the Senate and the necessary steps, as
 applicable, shall be taken to bring the [such] appropriation to
 within:
 (1)  the estimated revenue, either by providing
 additional revenue or reducing the appropriation; or
 (2)  an amount that, when added to other amounts
 appropriated from the economic stabilization fund in bills
 certified under Subsection (c)(2) of this section, will not exceed
 the limitation on appropriations from that fund prescribed by
 Section 49-g(g-1) of this article.
 SECTION 2.  Section 49-g, Article III, Texas Constitution,
 is amended by adding Subsections (g-1), (g-2), and (g-3) to read as
 follows:
 (g-1)  Except as provided by Subsection (g-2) of this
 section, the total amount of appropriations of money from the
 economic stabilization fund for all or any part of a state fiscal
 biennium may not exceed the estimated maximum amount the
 comptroller determines may be appropriated so that the
 unappropriated balance of the economic stabilization fund at all
 times during the biennium is an amount equal to at least five
 percent of the amount of the biennial state taxes and fees general
 revenue estimate provided in advance of the regular legislative
 session preceding that biennium. For purposes of this subsection,
 "biennial state taxes and fees general revenue estimate" means the
 amount of revenue stated in the comptroller's estimate provided in
 advance of the regular legislative session as required by Section
 49a(a) of this article that, based on the laws in effect at the time
 the estimate is made, is anticipated to be received by and for the
 state from collections of taxes and fees the revenue from which is
 anticipated to be deposited to the credit of the general revenue
 fund and is not set aside by law for a particular purpose or entity.
 The term does not include probable changes to that anticipated
 revenue as shown in supplemental statements submitted in accordance
 with Section 49a(a) of this article.
 (g-2)  The limitation on appropriations prescribed by
 Subsection (g-1) of this section does not apply in a case of
 emergency and imperative public necessity and with a four-fifths
 vote of the total membership of each house of the legislature.
 (g-3)  The authority to make an appropriation from the
 economic stabilization fund under Subsection (k), (l), or (m) of
 this section is subject to the endorsement of the comptroller's
 certificate under Section 49a(c)(2) of this article.
 SECTION 3.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION.  (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, limiting appropriations from the economic
 stabilization fund to a total amount that the comptroller of public
 accounts estimates will not result at any time in a fund balance of
 less than a prescribed minimum amount, other than in an emergency if
 certain requirements are met.
 (b)  The amendments made to Sections 49a and 49-g, Article
 III, of this constitution take effect January 1, 2017, and apply
 only to an appropriation made for all or part of a state fiscal year
 beginning on or after September 1, 2017.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 4.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment limiting
 appropriations from the economic stabilization fund ("rainy day
 fund") to a total amount that the comptroller of public accounts
 estimates will not result at any time in a fund balance of less than
 a prescribed minimum amount, other than in an emergency if certain
 requirements are met."