Senate | 04/14/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 816 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 696 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 653 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 653 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 383 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 367 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 367 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |