1 | 1 | | 84R6358 JAM-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Huffines S.J.R. No. 42 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A JOINT RESOLUTION |
---|
6 | 6 | | proposing a constitutional amendment prescribing the purposes for |
---|
7 | 7 | | which revenues from motor vehicle registration fees and taxes on |
---|
8 | 8 | | motor fuels and lubricants may be used. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 7-a, Article VIII, Texas Constitution, |
---|
11 | 11 | | is amended to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 7-a. Subject to legislative appropriation, allocation |
---|
13 | 13 | | and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment of all |
---|
14 | 14 | | refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived from |
---|
15 | 15 | | motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross |
---|
16 | 16 | | production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used |
---|
17 | 17 | | to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the |
---|
18 | 18 | | sole purpose of acquiring rights-of-way and[,] constructing, |
---|
19 | 19 | | maintaining, and policing such public roadways, and for the |
---|
20 | 20 | | administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature |
---|
21 | 21 | | pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads; |
---|
22 | 22 | | [and for the payment of the principal and interest on county and |
---|
23 | 23 | | road district bonds or warrants voted or issued prior to January 2, |
---|
24 | 24 | | 1939, and declared eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment |
---|
25 | 25 | | out of the County and Road District Highway Fund under existing law; |
---|
26 | 26 | | provided, however, that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue from |
---|
27 | 27 | | the motor fuel tax shall be allocated to the Available School Fund; |
---|
28 | 28 | | and,] provided, however, that the net revenue derived by counties |
---|
29 | 29 | | from motor vehicle registration fees shall never be less than the |
---|
30 | 30 | | maximum amounts allowed to be retained by each County and the |
---|
31 | 31 | | percentage allowed to be retained by each County under the laws in |
---|
32 | 32 | | effect on January 1, 1945. Nothing contained herein shall be |
---|
33 | 33 | | construed as authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any |
---|
34 | 34 | | purpose. |
---|
35 | 35 | | SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to |
---|
36 | 36 | | the Texas Constitution: |
---|
37 | 37 | | TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies |
---|
38 | 38 | | to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature, |
---|
39 | 39 | | Regular Session, 2015, prescribing the purposes for which revenues |
---|
40 | 40 | | from motor vehicle registration fees and taxes on motor fuels and |
---|
41 | 41 | | lubricants may be used. |
---|
42 | 42 | | (b) The changes to Section 7-a, Article VIII, of this |
---|
43 | 43 | | constitution made by the amendment apply only in connection with a |
---|
44 | 44 | | state fiscal biennium that begins on or after September 1, 2017. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (c) This temporary provision expires September 2, 2017. |
---|
46 | 46 | | SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be |
---|
47 | 47 | | submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015. |
---|
48 | 48 | | The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the |
---|
49 | 49 | | proposition: "The constitutional amendment prescribing the |
---|
50 | 50 | | purposes for which revenues from motor vehicle registration fees |
---|
51 | 51 | | and taxes on motor fuels and lubricants may be used." |
---|