E
|
06/01/2015
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 3643
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3622
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3510
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5642
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1750
|
Journal Page: 5642
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5638
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 3385
|
Journal Page: 5637
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3131
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3131
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1035
|
Journal Page: 3131
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2651
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1352
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1352
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2450
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2450
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2450
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1292
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1264
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2200
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#477
|
Journal Page: 2199
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Adopted as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2199
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Amended
|
3-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 2199
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2196
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HJR 13
|
Journal Page: 2196
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 638
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 615
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 580
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 358
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 335
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 335
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 335
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 335
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 335
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 335
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Rodrguez
|
Journal Page: 335
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 334
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 334
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 334
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 334
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 344
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 327
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 313
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 285
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 268
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 252
|
Senate
|
02/17/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 221
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 207
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 192
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 192
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|