By: Nichols, et al. S.J.R. No. 5 (In the Senate - Filed February 4, 2015; February 9, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation; March 2, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1; March 2, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 5 By: Nichols SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION proposing a constitutional amendment dedicating certain revenue derived from the tax imposed on the sale, use, or rental of a motor vehicle to the state highway fund. BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by adding Section 7-c to read as follows: Sec. 7-c. (a) Subject to Subsection (c) of this section, the net revenue derived from the tax authorized by Chapter 152, Tax Code, or its successor, and imposed on the sale, use, or rental of a motor vehicle that exceeds the first $2.5 billion of that revenue coming into the treasury in a state fiscal year shall be deposited as follows: (1) the next $2.5 billion of that revenue coming into the treasury in that state fiscal year shall be deposited to the credit of the state highway fund; and (2) any additional revenue to which this subsection applies that comes into the treasury in that state fiscal year shall be deposited: (A) one-half to the credit of the state highway fund; and (B) the remainder to the credit of the general revenue fund. (b) Money deposited to the credit of the state highway fund under this section may be appropriated only to: (1) construct, maintain, or acquire rights-of-way for public roadways other than toll roads; or (2) repay the principal of and interest on general obligation bonds issued as authorized by Section 49-p, Article III, of this constitution. (c) Revenue described by Subsection (a) of this section that, under general law in effect on January 1, 2015, was required to be deposited to the credit of a fund outside the general revenue fund from which money could be appropriated only for a purpose that decreases the rates of, or reduces reliance on, ad valorem taxes imposed to fund public schools is not included as part of the first $5 billion coming into the treasury for purposes of Subsection (a) of this section, and the requirements applicable to the deposit of money in excess of $2.5 billion prescribed by Subsection (a) of this section do not apply to that revenue to the extent general law continues to require the deposit of that revenue as described by this subsection and limit the appropriation of that revenue to the purpose described by this subsection. SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to the Texas Constitution: TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, dedicating certain revenue derived from the tax imposed on the sale, use, or rental of a motor vehicle to the state highway fund. (b) The changes to Article VIII of this constitution made by the amendment take effect September 1, 2017. (c) Beginning with the state fiscal year beginning on September 1, 2017, the legislature may not appropriate any revenue to which Section 7-c(a)(1) or (2)(A), Article VIII, of this constitution applies for any purpose other than a purpose described by Section 7-c(b), Article VIII, of this constitution. (d) This temporary provision expires September 1, 2018. SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 8, 2016. The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the proposition: "The constitutional amendment dedicating certain revenue derived from the tax imposed on the sale, use, or rental of a motor vehicle to the state highway fund." * * * * *