House | 05/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4468 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2062 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1159 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffines | Journal Page: 1113 |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1113 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1113 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 613 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 613 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |