Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR110 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/09/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 110
 In Memory
 of
 Rodolfo M. Rodriguez
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the citizens
 of San Antonio in mourning the loss of Rodolfo M. Rodriguez, who
 died December 30, 2014, at the age of 89; and
 WHEREAS, Rodolfo Rodriguez was born on August 11, 1925, in
 Piedras Negras, Coahuila, Mexico, to Jacobo Rodriguez and Petra
 Munoz; he married his beloved wife, the late Gregoria G. Rodriguez,
 on February 27, 1949, and they raised six children together and
 were blessed with grandchildren and great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, In 1954, they moved to San Antonio, where
 Rodolfo's family had roots dating back to the original settlers
 from the Canary Islands and to the Battle of the Alamo; he began a
 career in the insurance business with the Southern Life Insurance
 Company but soon moved to the Prudential Life Insurance Company,
 where he served with distinction for more than 30 years; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Rodriguez was a devout Christian who
 practiced his faith in his daily life; he was a member of La
 Trinidad Methodist Church in San Antonio for many years before
 joining Cornerstone Church, where he and Gregoria played a vital
 role in establishing a Spanish-language ministry and where he
 served as a church elder, lay minister, and Bible study teacher; and
 WHEREAS, A man of courage, strength, and compassion, he
 gave generously to others, and his wisdom and his enthusiasm for
 living each day to the fullest will not be forgotten; and
 WHEREAS, He was a devoted husband, father, and grandfather,
 and he leaves behind memories that will be cherished forever by his
 family and countless friends; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 84th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Rodolfo M. Rodriguez; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Rodolfo M. Rodriguez.
 Van de Putte
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 9, 2015, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate