Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR222 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/23/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 222
 In Memory
 of
 Joe Glenn Barton
 WHEREAS, A life made rich through meaningful service drew
 to a close when Constable Joe Glenn Barton of Farmersville passed
 away on January 10, 2015, at the age of 64; and
 WHEREAS, Born on May 5, 1950, in Waxahachie, Joe Barton was
 the only child of Joe Ab and Billie Gardner Barton; at a young
 age, he moved with his family to Garland, where he graduated from
 Garland High School in 1968; he married Eva Hartsell on January 14,
 1972, and the couple shared in the joy of raising a daughter
 together, Jessica Autumn Barton; and
 WHEREAS, Constable Barton began his career in law
 enforcement working as a dispatcher for the McKinney Police
 Department; during his 14 years there, he distinguished himself
 in a series of assignments as patrol officer, patrol sergeant,
 detective sergeant, lieutenant of operations, and interim chief
 of police; after leaving the force, he began his tenure as Collin
 County constable for Precinct 2 on January 1, 1989; he was
 reelected six times and held that office for a total of 26 years; and
 WHEREAS, In addition to ably meeting the demands of his
 professional career, Constable Barton was actively involved in
 the Farmersville community; he was a longtime member and former
 president of the Rotary Club, which twice honored him with the
 Rotary Club Governor's Award for his service; he chaired the
 Chaparral Rails to Trails committee for close to 20 years, and he
 also helped to coordinate the 2002 Audie Murphy Day event;
 moreover, he was a faithful congregant at the First Baptist
 Church of Farmersville, and he was a volunteer for Meals on
 Wheels for well over a decade; in 2003, his exceptional efforts
 earned him the Harry O. Cameron Citizen of the Year award from the
 Farmersville Chamber of Commerce; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted family man and an exemplary public
 servant, Constable Joe Glenn Barton will long be remembered with
 deep affection and admiration by all those who were fortunate
 enough to have known him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 84th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Constable Joe
 Glenn Barton and extend sincere sympathy to the members of his
 family: to his wife, Eva Barton; to his daughter, Autumn Barton;
 to his mother-in-law, Opal Hartsell; and to his other relatives
 and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Constable Joe Glenn Barton.
 Taylor of Collin
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 23, 2015,
  by a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate