Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR363 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/11/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 363
 In Memory
 of
 Brett Aaron Aycock
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the citizens
 of Austin in mourning the loss of Brett Aaron Aycock, who died
 February 24, 2015, at the age of 33; and
 WHEREAS, Brett Aycock was born on June 7, 1981, in Oklahoma
 City; he moved to Austin as a young boy, and he attended Anderson
 High School, where he excelled in both academics and athletics;
 he began studying criminal justice at The University of Texas at
 Austin, but he was inspired to set a new course for his life after
 the terrorist attacks of September 11, 2001; and
 WHEREAS, Sergeant Aycock enlisted in the United States
 Army in 2003 and served with distinction as a member of the
 Reconnaissance/Scout Platoon, Headquarters and Headquarters
 Company, 1st Battalion Airborne, 503rd Infantry Regiment; he
 completed air assault training in South Korea and was deployed to
 Kuwait and then to Iraq, where he was wounded in action while
 serving in Ramadi; he was decorated with a Purple Heart and was
 awarded a number of medals in honor of his courageous service,
 including the Army Commendation Medal, the Army Achievement
 Medal, and a Combat Infantryman Badge; and
 WHEREAS, After his service, he managed large construction
 projects and worked as a consultant on military techniques and as
 an actor for the television production of "My Generation"; he
 also dedicated his time to serving as an advocate for his fellow
 veterans; and
 WHEREAS, He was a skilled artist and craftsman who was
 known for his many talents, his kind nature, and his engaging
 sense of humor; he was a true patriot and an American hero who was
 respected and admired by many, and he leaves behind memories that
 will long be cherished by all who were privileged to share in his
 life; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 84th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Brett Aaron Aycock; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Brett Aaron Aycock.
 Watson
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 11, 2015, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate