Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR822 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/15/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 822
 In Memory
 of
 Oralia T. Villarreal
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the citizens
 of Alamo in mourning the loss of Oralia T. Villarreal, who died on
 April 5, 2015, at the age of 79; and
 WHEREAS, Oralia Villarreal was born on May 20, 1935, in Taft,
 Texas; she enriched the lives of all who knew her through her
 warmth and kindness and her enthusiasm for living each day to the
 fullest; and
 WHEREAS, She married Rudy Villarreal on July 2, 1956, and
 they were blessed with eight children; she found immense
 fulfilment in caring for her family, and over the years she was
 blessed with 15 grandchildren and 13 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Villarreal was an excellent cook who was
 noted for her delicious tamales; her favorite pastimes included
 playing Scrabble and watching the San Antonio Spurs, and she
 enjoyed traveling the country with her husband, who served for
 many years as the mayor of Alamo; and
 WHEREAS, A woman of integrity and strength, Oralia Villarreal
 gave unselfishly of her time to others; she was respected and
 admired by many, and she leaves behind memories that will long
 be cherished by all who were privileged to share in her life;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 84th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Oralia T. Villarreal; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 her family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Oralia Villarreal.
 Lucio
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 15, 2015, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate