Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House of Representatives 2015 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR46

Urging Congress to require the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs to provide VA services to incarcerated veterans detained in state hospitals and to consider expanding such services to all incarcerated veterans.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR47

Congratulating San Patricio County Judge Terry Simpson on being named the 2014 Newsmaker of the Year by the Corpus Christi Caller-Times.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR48

Inviting the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on February 17, 2015.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR49

Urging Congress to propose and submit to the states an amendment to the U.S. Constitution that overturns Citizens United v. Federal Election Commission, establishing that the spending of money to influence elections shall not be construed as speech under the First Amendment, and clarifying that only natural persons are protected by constitutional rights.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR50

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 29, 2015, and ending on Monday, February 2, 2015.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR51

Commemorating the centennial of the King Ranch Main House.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR52

Authorizing the State Preservation Board, subject to state law and rules of the board, to approve and permit the relocation of the Texas Game Warden Memorial to a site at the State Capitol, south of the Sam Houston Building, just outside of the historical grounds.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR53

Inviting the chief justice of the Supreme Court of Texas to address a joint session of the legislature on February 18, 2015.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR54

Memorializing Congress to propose and submit to the states for ratification a "Regulation Freedom Amendment" to the U.S. Constitution.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR55

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, February 5, 2015, and ending on Monday, February 9, 2015.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR56

Authorizing the lieutenant governor and speaker to appoint interim joint committees.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR57

Urging the U.S. Congress to end the ban on crude oil exports.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR58

Commemorating the life of Charlie Brown.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR59

Urging Congress to propose an amendment to the U.S. Constitution to provide for a balanced federal budget, except during a war.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR60

Honoring the Garza family of Peitas for their record of accomplishments in higher education.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records