Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate 2015 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR24

Authorizing the State Preservation Board to approve and permit the construction of a monument at the state Capitol Complex, at a site outside the historic Capitol grounds, honoring Texans who served during the Global War on Terror as part of the United States armed forces and their families.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR25

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 11, 2015, and ending on Monday, March 16, 2015.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR26

Directing the governor to award the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor posthumously to Lieutenant Colonel Ed Dyess.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR27

Expressing opposition to EPA-proposed guidelines regarding carbon dioxide emissions from existing fossil fuel-fired power plants under Section 111(d) of the Clean Air Act.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR28

Recognizing April 2015 as Autism Awareness Month.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR29

Urging Congress to update Voting Rights Act provisions to protect against voter discrimination.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR3

Providing for procedures for the canvass of votes for the governor and lieutenant governor and the inauguration of the governor and lieutenant governor, and inviting the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on January 15, 2015.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR30

Directing the Texas Facilities Commission to rename the State Insurance Building Annex in the Capitol Complex the John G. Tower State Office Building.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR31

Designating Hico as the official Steak Capital of Texas.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR32

Urging Congress to expedite natural gas exports.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR33

Designating September 8 as Major Jefferson Van Horne Day for a 10-year period beginning in 2015.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR34

Directing the Texas Water Development Board to conduct a feasibility study on the use of brackish groundwater sources in Montgomery County.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR35

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 25, 2015, and ending on Monday, March 30, 2015.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR36

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, April 1, 2015, and ending on Tuesday, April 7, 2015.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR37

Urging Congress to encourage the Department of Defense to relocate the United States Africa Command to Ellington Field Joint Reserve Base in Houston.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records