Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR25

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 11, 2015, and ending on Monday, March 16, 2015.

Impact

The resolution had implications for the legislative calendar and workflow. By allowing for a longer adjournment, lawmakers could allocate more time for discussions and deliberations on various bills without the pressure of a rigid adjournment timeline. This flexibility was aimed at enhancing the legislative process, particularly during critical points in the session when important matters were being considered.

Summary

SCR25, a Senate Concurrent Resolution, addresses the Texas legislature's ability to adjourn for more than three days. Specifically, it seeks to grant permission for both the House and Senate to extend their adjournment window during a specified period in March 2015. This is predicated on Section 17 of Article III of the Texas Constitution, which stipulates that neither the House nor the Senate can adjourn beyond three days without mutual consent. By passing this resolution, the legislature aimed to manage its schedule more effectively during that period.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SCR25 was notably supportive, with both legislative chambers adopting the resolution without opposition— the Senate approved it with a unanimous vote of 30-0, and the House followed suit with a vote of 137-0. This broad consensus indicates a recognition of the necessity for operational flexibility within the legislative schedule, reflecting a cooperative spirit among lawmakers.

Contention

While SCR25 experienced no significant opposition or contention during its passage, it nonetheless highlights an important aspect of legislative procedure concerning session management. The lack of dissent implies a strong agreement on the necessity for occasional adjustments to legislative operations, allowing members to manage other pressing commitments effectively without sacrificing legislative deliberation.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR8

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.