E | 03/18/2015 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 502 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 855 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 425 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 453 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 386 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#53 | Journal Page: 638 |
House | 03/12/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 638 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 638 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 635 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 368 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 368 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 368 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 368 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |