E
|
05/29/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
E
|
05/18/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3742
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3746
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3663
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2036
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 2033
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2030
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2029
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1804
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1716
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#323
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1627
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#299
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
19-Schaefer
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
15-Israel
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
16-Israel
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
15-Israel
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
13-Israel
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Amended
|
12-Tinderholt, et al.
|
Journal Page: 1616
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 1615
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Amendment as amended fails of adoption
|
10-Blanco
|
Journal Page: 1614
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Motion to table fails
|
11-Schaefer
|
Journal Page: 1612
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
11-Schaefer
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1586
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 278
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 278
|
House
|
02/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|