E | 05/23/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/23/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4837 | |
E | 05/16/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3665 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2001 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3603 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3606 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3386 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1832 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1832 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1832 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1832 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1832 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1832 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1832 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 1827 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1534 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1011 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1541 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Record vote | RV#243 | Journal Page: 1494 |
House | 04/13/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1483 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1483 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 866 | |
House | 03/13/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 552 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 552 | |
House | 01/12/2017 | Filed |