Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2113
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2068
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1906
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3456
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3260
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1155
|
Journal Page: 3260
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3260
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3260
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3171
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1118
|
Journal Page: 3171
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3171
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Workman and Springer
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 8, Section 1(d)
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/9/17 7:31 PM
|
Journal Page: 3136
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3136
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/9/17 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2988
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2988
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1803
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 553
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 553
|
House
|
01/12/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|