Senate | 05/01/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1360 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2116 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Record vote | RV#559 | Journal Page: 2115 |
House | 04/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2115 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2115 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2055 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Amendment adopted as amended | 2-Murphy | Journal Page: 2055 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Amendment amended | 3-Gooden | Journal Page: 2054 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | 2-Murphy | Journal Page: 2054 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Amended | 1-Martinez | Journal Page: 2054 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2054 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1430 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/14/2017 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 303 | |
House | 02/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 303 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |